Case: 05-99-00176-CV
05-99-00176-CV
02/04/1999
Mandamus
Wayne Z. Burkhead, Jr., M.D. Individually W. B. Carrell Memorial Clinic, Associated
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
06/06/2017 | Order entered | Destroy | | ||
11/30/2016 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
09/21/1999 | Record Retention | Destroy |
| ||
02/08/1999 | Opinion issued | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
02/08/1999 | Opinion issued | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
02/04/1999 | Motion for Leave to File Mandamus | | |||
02/04/1999 | 75.00 Fee Paid | | |||
02/04/1999 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/06/2017 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Hon. Anne Ashby | Respondent | dallas Judge |
Wayne Z. Burkhead, M.D., Jr. | Relator | Katherine L. Laws |
Sammy And Glinda Thomason | Real Party in Interest | Gregory Preston Gorman Stephen F. Malouf |
Wayne Z. Burkhead, M.D., Jr. | Relator | Charles G. Bell |
Trial Court Information
134th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Edwin V King
95-09380