Case: 04-83-00458-CV
04-83-00458-CV
09/27/1983
Summary Judgment
Combined Benefit Administrators, Inc.
Mercy Hospital of Laredo
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/18/1985 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/18/1985 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/23/1985 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
01/23/1985 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded | |
12/17/1984 | No New Event but Update in Calendar | | |
12/11/1984 | Submission | | |
12/11/1984 | Submitted | | |
10/16/1984 | Case ready to be set | | |
11/30/1983 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
11/28/1983 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
11/28/1983 | Case ready to be set | | |
11/21/1983 | Brief Filed | | |
11/07/1983 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
10/26/1983 | Brief Filed | | |
09/28/1983 | No Description Available. | | |
09/28/1983 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
09/27/1983 | Notice of appeal received | | |
09/23/1983 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |
09/01/1983 | Judgment Signed in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/18/1985 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
111th Judicial District Court
Webb
Honorable Antonio Zardenetta
33,947
n/a