judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HICKS, WILLIE C. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 83-CF-1556
Short Caption:HICKS, WILLIE C. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Lead: 83-CF-1239 Consolidated:83-CF-1556
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F7642-81Filed Date:12/19/1983

Opening Event Date:12/19/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/20/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/26/1986
Argued/Submitted:05/28/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
W. Gary KohlmanYN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Daniel S. Seikaly YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael W. Farrell NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HICKS, WILLIE C. UNITED STATES
12/19/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/20/1984FiledRecord Completed
02/26/1986FiledBriefing Completed
05/28/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/30/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition