judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-450
A-450
01/27/1945
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
GRAYBURG OIL COMPANY
BASCOM GILES, COMMISSIONER OF THE GENERAL LAND OFFICE OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/10/1945Motion for RehearingRelator
03/05/1945Supplemental Brief filedRelator
03/03/1945Brief on the MeritsRespondent
02/07/1945Exhibits in case/cause filed
02/07/1945Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
02/07/1945Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
01/27/1945Brief on the MeritsRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/26/1945Letter Filed
04/10/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/05/1945Supplemental Brief filed
03/03/1945Brief on the Merits
02/07/1945Exhibits in case/cause filed
02/07/1945Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
02/07/1945Brief in Support of Petition
02/07/1945Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
01/27/1945Brief on the Merits
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Grayburg Oil CompanyRelator
Bascom Giles, Commissioner of the General Land Office of TexasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information