judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-483
A-483
02/12/1945
Application for Writ of Error
CATHERYN MAY, ET AL.
JEAN W. BROWN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/30/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/29/1945Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
11/29/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/18/1945Response to Brief filedPetitioner
05/11/1945Brief on the MeritsRespondent
02/23/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
02/12/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/01/1945Letter Filed
11/30/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/29/1945Brief in Support of Petition
11/29/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/14/1945Letter Filed
05/18/1945Response to Brief filed
05/11/1945Brief on the Merits
04/18/1945Document received (See Remarks)
02/23/1945Response to Petition
02/19/1945Addendum to brief filed
02/12/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/12/1945Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jean W. BrownRespondent
Catheryn May, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information