judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PATRICK J. REGAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-14-0196)
Case Number:S-14-0196Case Docketed On:08/07/2014
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:PATRICK J. REGAN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:PATRICK J. REGAN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPatrick J. ReganDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPeter K. Michael
David L. Delicath
Jenny Lynn Craig
Darrell Duane Jackson
A. Walker Steinhage
John D. Ringenberg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2015 WY 62
Citation:350 P.3d 702

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/07/2014Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/07/2014Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/07/2014Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/23/2014Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/23/2014Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/10/2014Notice-Incoming - Consent and ApprovalNotice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
11/10/2014Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/12/2014Event - Hardcopy received - Consent and ApprovalEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/12/2014Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/02/2014Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/03/2014Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
12/08/2014Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
12/08/2014Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I - Original Papers; Volume II - Transcripts; Volume III - Confidential FileRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/08/2014Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
12/08/2014Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Eric M. Alden obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/17/2014Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from John Ringenberg obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/14/2015Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Burke, Justices Hill, Kite, Davis and Fox (Eric M. Alden obo Appellant; Jenny L. Craig, John D. Ringenberg, argument by Mr. Ringenberg obo Appellee) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/28/2015Opinion - Opinion and journal order, reversed and remanded with Justice Davis writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/14/2015Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/14/2015Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/14/2015Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/14/2015Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal