Case Information: 36810 | |||
Short Caption: | LARASON VS. HERMANSON | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A388132 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 11/09/2000 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/28/2000 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Marvin M. Janeway for Stacy Larason. | ||
09/28/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-17152 | |
10/10/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] | 00-17922 | |
11/09/2000 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Volumes 1 and 2. Mailed on: 11/06/00. | 00-19737 | |
11/09/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/17/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB | 02-01235 | |
02/12/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 and 2 this day. | 02-01548 | |
02/12/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/26/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 14, 2002. | 02-01548 |