judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DAVID A. YOVANOVICH and ORNELLA DALLA BONA v. JOYCE HALLING and MEDCON, INC., a Utah corporation

Case Heading (S-16-0164)
Parent: S-16-0163 Case Docketed On:06/23/2016
Consolidated:S-16-0164
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Lincoln CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:DAVID A. YOVANOVICH and ORNELLA DALLA BONA v. JOYCE HALLING and MEDCON, INC., a Utah corporation
Full Title:DAVID A. YOVANOVICH and ORNELLA DALLA BONA, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. JOYCE HALLING and MEDCON, INC., a Utah corporation, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDavid A. YovanovichLaurie Jean Stern
James Kent Lubing
AppellantOrnella Dalla BonaLaurie Jean Stern
James Kent Lubing
AppelleeJoyce HallingRay Glen Martineau
AppelleeMedCon, Inc., a Utah CorporationRay Glen Martineau

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts
Opinion Number:2017 WY 28
Citation:391 P.3d 611

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
06/23/2016Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
06/23/2016Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
06/23/2016Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
06/23/2016Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
08/10/2016Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
08/12/2016Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Brief on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/19/2016Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Laurie J. Stern obo AppellantsNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
09/19/2016Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - James K. Lubing obo AppellantsNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
09/19/2016Motion - OtherMotionOtherFinal
09/21/2016Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of Appearance (L. Stern); Entry of Appearance (J. Lubing); and Agreed Motion for Substitution of Counsel and Withdrawal of CounselEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/21/2016Order Allowing Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (Leah K. Corrigan withdrawn as counsel for David A. Yovanovich & Ornella Dalla Bona)OrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
09/26/2016Brief - Appellees (Caption Incorrect)BriefAppelleeFinal
09/27/2016Notice-Incoming - Errata (Correcting Caption on Brief of Appellees)Notice-IncomingErrataFinal
09/30/2016Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Brief (incorrect caption); and received designation of record - wrong header (was filed in Dist. Court)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/03/2016Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' Brief Errata SheetEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/05/2016Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/11/2016Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
10/13/2016Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply Brief; and received Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/17/2016Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/17/2016Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
10/25/2016Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
10/25/2016Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes, original papersRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/25/2016Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/07/2016Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting received by Ray Martineau obo Joyce Halling and MedCon Inc.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/08/2016Event - Phone Call from Jen at Lubing Law Group. Laurie Jean Stern will now be presenting oral argument instead of James Kent Lubing. She will send a new oral argument acknowledgement receipt form.EventPhone CallFinal
11/14/2016Event - Phone Call from counsel for appellee in S-16-0164. Will be submitting a motion to vacate oral argument this morning as the case will be settled.EventPhone CallFinal
11/14/2016Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
11/14/2016Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting received by Laurie J. Stern obo appellees Yovanovich & BonaNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
11/14/2016Order - Vacating oral argument and assigning to brief only docketOrderVacating oral argument and assigning to brief only docketFinal
11/14/2016Order - Assigning to brief only docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/09/2017Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part, reversing in part, and remanding. Justice Fox writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/27/2017Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/27/2017Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/27/2017Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/27/2017Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/03/2017Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 3/31/2017 by Miranda SheltonServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal