Case Information: 36800 | |||
Short Caption: | INDEPENDENT AMERICAN PARTY VS. LOMAX | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - NONE | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/26/2000 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Joel F. Hansen & Associates--check no. 2227. | ||
09/26/2000 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 00-16948 | |
10/03/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Expedited Consideration and Motion to Consolidate Hearing (nos. 36779/36800). | 00-17542 | |
10/04/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. Order Denying Petitions for Writs of Mandamus. These are petitions for writs of mandamus challenging the practice of the registrar of voters for Clark County, pursuant to NRS 293.260(4)(a), of declaring one candidate the nominee in the general election because that candidate received a majority of votes in the primary election, when there were no candidates from any other party participating in the election. " . . . we deny the petitions." fn1[In light of our order, we deny the September 25, 2000, motion for expedited consideration as moot.] En Banc. CY/WM/MS/DA/ML/NB Nos. 36779, 36800. | 00-17569 | |
10/23/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. On October 3, 2000, petitioners in Docket No. 36800 filed a motion for expedited consideration of their petition for a writ of mandamus and for consolidation of their petition with the petition for a writ of mandamus in Docket No. 36779. On October 4 2000, this court denied both petitions. We deny the motion for expedited consideration and for consolidation as moot. Nos. 36779, 36800. | 00-18747 | |
10/31/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 00-17610 | |
10/31/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |