Case: A-491
A-491
02/15/1945
Application for Writ of Error
LUFKIN-BEAUMONT MOTOR COACHES, INC.
RILEY ALEXANDER
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/29/1945 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
02/27/1945 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | | |
02/24/1945 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
02/15/1945 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/29/1945 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
02/27/1945 | Reply to Response | | ||
02/24/1945 | Response to Petition | | ||
02/17/1945 | Additional Copies received | | ||
02/15/1945 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Refused | | |
02/15/1945 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Riley Alexander | Respondent | |
Lufkin-Beaumont Motor Coaches, Inc. | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information