judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FEARS, WILLIE R. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CF-0746
Short Caption:FEARS, WILLIE R. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3909-81Filed Date:06/03/1982

Opening Event Date:06/03/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/02/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/06/1983
Argued/Submitted:03/16/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Calvin Steinmetz NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FEARS, WILLIE R. UNITED STATES
01/01/1906 USA DONALD J. ALLISON
06/03/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/02/1982FiledRecord Completed
01/06/1983FiledBriefing Completed
03/16/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/25/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition