Case Heading (S-16-0166) | |||||
Case Number: | S-16-0166 | Case Docketed On: | 06/30/2016 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Eighth Judicial District Converse County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509 | ||
Short Title: | KENNETH EUGENE CHRISTOPHER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | KENNETH EUGENE CHRISTOPHER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Kenneth Eugene Christopher | Pro Se |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Peter K. Michael David L. Delicath Christyne Marie Martens |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law |
Opinion Number: | 2016 WY 114 |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
06/30/2016 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
06/30/2016 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
06/30/2016 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
08/17/2016 | Brief - Anders | Brief | Anders | Final | |
08/17/2016 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
08/17/2016 | Motion - Withdrawal of counsel | Motion | Withdrawal of counsel | Final | |
08/17/2016 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Pursuant to Anders v. California, 386 U.S. 738 (1967); Motion for Extension of Time to File Pro Se Brief; and Motion to Withdraw as Counsel | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
08/17/2016 | Record - Received unfiled record from Appellate counsel | Record | Received unfiled record | Final | |
08/18/2016 | Order - Grant Anders Extension pro se brief | Order | Grant Anders Extension pro se brief | Final | |
09/27/2016 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Pro Se Brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
09/27/2016 | Order - Grant - extension of time | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
10/27/2016 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
10/27/2016 | Order - Grant - extension of time | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
11/17/2016 | Brief - Appellant (Pro-se after Anders Brief, no certificate of service) | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
11/17/2016 | Event - Phone Call with AG and PD advising of filing of brief | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
11/30/2016 | Opinion - Published Order Affirming the District Court's Judgment and Sentence | Opinion | Published order | Final | |
12/16/2016 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
12/16/2016 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
12/16/2016 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
12/22/2016 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record received 12/19/16 | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |