judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HARRY E. STEPHENS v. GREGORY D. LAVITT, DEBRA C. LAVITT, and CASHEL PARTNERS, LLC, formerly NEPTUNE PARTNERS, LTD

Case Heading (S-14-0189)
Case Number:S-14-0189Case Docketed On:07/28/2014
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Highways (Title 24)
Short Title:HARRY E. STEPHENS v. GREGORY D. LAVITT, DEBRA C. LAVITT, and CASHEL PARTNERS, LLC, formerly NEPTUNE PARTNERS, LTD
Full Title:HARRY E. STEPHENS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. GREGORY D. LAVITT, DEBRA C. LAVITT, and CASHEL PARTNERS, LLC, formerly NEPTUNE PARTNERS, LTD, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantHarry E. StephensFrank J. Jones
AppelleeGregory D. LavittMitchell H. Edwards
AppelleeDebra C. LavittMitchell H. Edwards
AppelleeCashell Partners, LTDJenifer E. Calkins Scoggin
Beau Bryan Bump

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure, Roads
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
07/28/2014Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
07/28/2014Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
07/28/2014Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
07/28/2014Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/29/2014Notice-Outgoing - Other - Notice to attorney Beau Bump concerning e-filing requirements and service of ordersNotice-OutgoingOtherFinal
07/30/2014Event - Phone Call re caption, Cashell Partners, LTD changed to Cashel Partners, LLC. Notice sent to counsel and District CourtEventPhone CallFinal
08/29/2014Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/02/2014Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/03/2014Order - Denying Appellant's Request for Extension to File BriefOrderDenyFinal
09/15/2014Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/15/2014Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/03/2014Brief - Appellee Cashel Partners, LLC (File stamp shows 11/4/2014, but it was timely filed and inadvertently deleted by clerk on 11/3/2014)BriefAppelleeFinal
11/03/2014Brief - Appellees LavittsBriefAppelleeFinal
11/03/2014Motion - Supplement the recordMotionSupplement the recordFinal
11/03/2014Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Cashel Partners, LLC.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/03/2014Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee Cashel Partners, LLC's Motion to Supplement Record Pursuant to Rule 3.04 of the Wyoming Rules of Appellate Procedure; and proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/04/2014Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellees LavittsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/24/2014Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
11/24/2014Motion - Assign to Expedited DocketMotionOtherFinal
11/25/2014Order - Other - Order Granting Motion to Supplement the RecordOrderOtherFinal
12/01/2014Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/01/2014Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volume I-IV - Original Papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/01/2014Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/07/2015Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/16/2015Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting received by Mitchell H. Edwards obo AppelleesNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/23/2015Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Jennifer E. Scoggin obo Appellee Cashel PartnersNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/23/2015Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
01/27/2015Event - Hardcopy received - Motion of Appellant to Dismiss AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/03/2015Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulated - Order Dismissing AppealOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
02/03/2015Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/17/2015Event - Reopened case for filing motion for fees and costs.EventOtherFinal
02/17/2015Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
02/17/2015Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee Cashel Partners, LLC's Statement of CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/17/2015Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
02/18/2015Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees Lavitts's Statement of costsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/27/2015Response/Objection - CostsResponse/ObjectionCostsFinal
03/06/2015Event - Hardcopy received - Stephens' Objection to Cashel Partners, LLC's Statement of Costs.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/10/2015Order - Awarding costsOrderAwarding costsFinal
03/10/2015Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal