Case Information: 36789 | |||
Short Caption: | JONES VS. HAMMOND | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 37008 , 37436 , 39586 , 40673 , 40739 , 40773 , 43123 , 43378 , 44213 , 49745 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A418488 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
09/25/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
09/25/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 00-16903 | |
10/12/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP00A-WM/ML/NB | 00-18037 | |
11/07/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-18198 | |
11/07/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/04/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 13, 2000. | 00-18198 |