James B Chadwell, Sr. v. James B Chadwell, II | § § § § § |
|
Attorneys | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Defendant | Chadwell, James B, II | |||
264 W 9th St Peru, IN 46970 | ||||
Plaintiff | Chadwell, James B, Sr. | Pro Se | ||
264 W 9th St Peru, IN 46970 |
05/05/2020 | Case Opened as a New Filing | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/05/2020 | Notice of Claim Filed
| ||||||||
05/05/2020 | Service Issued Sheriff
| ||||||||
05/05/2020 | Hearing Scheduling Activity Initial Hearing scheduled for 06/01/2020 at 2:00 PM. | ||||||||
05/06/2020 | Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 5/5/2020 : James B Chadwell | ||||||||
05/06/2020 | Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 5/5/2020 : James B Chadwell | ||||||||
05/08/2020 | Service Returned Served Sheriff Return Served/MAIL ONLY-COVID
| ||||||||
06/01/2020 | Initial Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Grund, J. David) |
Case Number | Style | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
---|
Case Number | Style | Filed/Location | Type/Status |
---|---|---|---|
52D01-2005-SC-000321 | James B Chadwell, Sr. v. James B Chadwell, II | 05/05/2020 Miami Superior Court 1 | SC - Small Claims Pending |