judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JONES, DAVID M. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 83-CF-1559
Short Caption:JONES, DAVID M. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2738-82Filed Date:12/21/1983

Opening Event Date:12/21/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/10/1986Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/09/1986
Argued/Submitted:01/20/1987
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
James W. KleinNY
AppellantJohn Doe N
Maureen T. Cannon YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Daniel S. Seikaly YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JONES, DAVID M. UNITED STATES
12/21/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/10/1986FiledRecord Completed
09/09/1986FiledBriefing Completed
01/20/1987FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/09/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition