judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 1908
1908
12/05/1931
Application for Writ of Error
KIRBY LUMBER COMPANY
TEMPLE LUMBER COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/27/1935Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
02/17/1935Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
09/19/1933Response to Brief filedPetitioner
08/19/1933Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/22/1933Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/22/1933Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
12/05/1931Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/04/1935Letter Filed
02/27/1935Supplemental Brief filed
02/17/1935Brief on the Merits
01/16/1935Miscellaneous letter
10/30/1934Motion to re-set submission date filed.Overruled
08/02/1934Stipulation Filed (see Remarks)
09/19/1933Response to Brief filed
08/19/1933Brief on the Merits
05/22/1933Brief on the Merits
05/22/1933Supplemental Brief filed
03/27/1933Letter Filed
03/16/1933Stipulation Filed (see Remarks)
03/16/1932Bond
03/09/1932Document received (See Remarks)
03/09/1932Document received (See Remarks)
03/09/1932Document received (See Remarks)
03/09/1932Document received (See Remarks)
12/05/1931Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
12/05/1931Document received (See Remarks)
12/05/1931Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Kirby Lumber CompanyPetitioner
Temple Lumber CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information