judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BAUMSTARK (JAMES) VS. STATE C/W 35354

Case Information: 34664
Short Caption:BAUMSTARK (JAMES) VS. STATE C/W 35354Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:34664*, 35354 Related Case(s): 35354
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C88508Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/14/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/13/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 99-07498
09/22/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The district court shall have 30 days to (1) enter a written judgment or order or (2) inform this court that it is reconsidering its decision. If the court enters a written judgment the clerk shall immediately transmit a certified copy of the judgment. 99-09017
01/28/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. Certified copy of the judgment or order due: 30 days from the date of this order. 00-01414
03/02/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on February 16, 2000. 00-03333
03/09/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 00-03721
07/14/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 3. Mailed on 07/12/00. 00-12205
07/14/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." fn14[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB. Nos. 34664/35354. 01-15406
10/09/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-15671
10/09/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/02/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 18, 2001. 01-15671