judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THREE SONS, LLC v. WYOMING OCCUPATIONAL HEALTH and SAFETY COMMISSION (OSHA)

Case Heading (S-07-0077)
Case Number:S-07-0077Case Docketed On:04/09/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:THREE SONS, LLC v. WYOMING OCCUPATIONAL HEALTH and SAFETY COMMISSION (OSHA)
Full Title:THREE SONS, LLC, Appellant (Petitioner), v. WYOMING OCCUPATIONAL HEALTH and SAFETY COMMISSION (OSHA), Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantThree Sons, LLCJohn R. Hursh
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Worker's Safety DivisionPatrick J. Crank
Kristi Marie Radosevich
Steven R. Czoschke

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure
Opinion Number:2008 WY 8
Citation:175 P.3d 618 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/09/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/09/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/09/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/18/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
06/29/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from counsel for appelleeNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
07/02/2007Brief - Appellee; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
07/13/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/19/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record; Volume III, TranscriptRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
08/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/16/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Kristi Radosevich on behalf of appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/22/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - John Hursh for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/18/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (John R. Hursh for appellant; Kristi M. Radosevich, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/18/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/29/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/14/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/14/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/14/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/14/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/19/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 2/15/08 by L. Glode.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal