judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-478
A-478
02/10/1945
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. JOSEPHINE G. WILSON
MRS. PEARLE MERCER FISHER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/13/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/26/1945Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
03/21/1945Brief on the MeritsRespondent
02/10/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/15/1945Response to Motion filed
06/13/1945Motion to Argue filed
06/13/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/26/1945Supplemental Brief filed
03/21/1945Brief on the Merits
03/09/1945Letter Filed
03/05/1945Bond
02/28/1945Document received (See Remarks)
02/28/1945Document received (See Remarks)
02/10/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mrs. Josephine G. WilsonPetitioner
Mrs. Pearle Mercer FisherRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information