Case: A-492
A-492
02/19/1945
Application for Writ of Error
ROBERT G. HARRIS, ET AL., STATE OF TEXAS, RICHARD CRITZ
THOMAS OCONNER, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/05/1946 | Supplemental Brief filed | Petitioner | | |
12/20/1945 | Brief in Support of Petition | Petitioner | | |
11/07/1945 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
11/07/1945 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
05/22/1945 | Brief in Support of Petition | Petitioner | | |
03/26/1945 | Errata Filed | Petitioner | | |
03/24/1945 | Response to Brief filed | Respondent | | |
03/15/1945 | Brief in Support of Petition | Petitioner | | |
02/23/1945 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
02/19/1945 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
02/19/1945 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/05/1946 | Supplemental Brief filed | | ||
12/28/1945 | Letter Filed | | ||
12/26/1945 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
12/20/1945 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
11/20/1945 | Motion for Extension of Time filed | Overruled | | |
11/12/1945 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
11/07/1945 | Additional Copies received | | ||
11/07/1945 | Additional Copies received | | ||
11/07/1945 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
11/07/1945 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
10/24/1945 | Order from Lower Court filed | | ||
05/22/1945 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
03/26/1945 | Errata Filed | | ||
03/24/1945 | Response to Brief filed | | ||
03/15/1945 | Brief in Support of Petition | | ||
02/23/1945 | Response to Petition | | ||
02/19/1945 | Additional Copies received | | ||
02/19/1945 | Additional Copies received | | ||
02/19/1945 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Refused | | |
02/19/1945 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Refused | | |
02/19/1945 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State of Texas | Petitioner | |
Thomas OConner, et al. | Respondent | |
Richard Critz | Petitioner | |
Robert G. Harris, et al. | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information