judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RAINS VS. NGA #2

Case Information: 34665
Short Caption:RAINS VS. NGA #2Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34612 , 38815 , 39088 , 39345 , 39645
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A353668Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/18/1999 / Christensen, CarlSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/29/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/13/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Marquis & Aurbach--check no. 48022.
08/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07518
08/18/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carl J. Christensen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/13/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 4, 1999. 99-08595
11/12/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-11170
02/18/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. We hereby consolidate the above-entitled matters for all appellate purposes. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Each appellant: 15 days to file a docketing statement. Upon the filing of the docketing statements, this court shall conduct a jurisdictional review of these appeals. Court Reporter Carrie A. Hansen: 30 days to prepare and complete the transcript of proceedings for May 10, 1999, May 19, 1999, May 24, 1999 and August 2, 1999, requested by appellant on August 19, 1999 (Docket No. 34612); Appellant (Docket No. 34665) 15 days to file a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request. Each appellant: 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant NGA #2 and appellant Rains.) Nos. 34612, 34665. 00-02574
02/28/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Response to Order. 00-03082
03/02/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellant Rains. Nos. 34612 & 34665. 00-03297
03/07/2000Order/Procedural Order. ACourt reporter Kimberly D. McAndrews shall have 30 days from the date of this order to prepare and complete the transcript of proceedings for May 10, 1999, May 19, 1999 and May 24, 1999 and to file with this court a certificate acknowledging delivery of the completed transcript, together with a certified copy of the transcript. Nos. 34612, 34665. 00-03559
03/08/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondent NGA #2. Nos. 34612 & 34665. 00-03642
05/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from the parties: 30 days from the date of this order. The preparation of transcripts and briefing schedule in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Nos. 34612, 34665. Document No. 00-07409.
06/05/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondent's Points and Authorities in Response to Supreme Court's Order to Show Cause (34612/34665). 00-09589
06/07/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Points and Authorities in Response to Supreme Court's Order to Show Cause (34612/34665). 00-09590
06/16/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Order Dismissing Appeal in docket No. 34612 and Reinstating Briefing in Docket No. 34665. We have considered the parties' response to our order to show cause and conclude that we lack jurisdiciton over the appeal in Docket Number 34612. "We therrefore dismiss the appeal in Docket No. 34612." We further conclude that the appeal in Docket Number 34665 may proceed. Court reporter, Carrie A. Hansen shall have 30 days from the date of th order to comply with the provisions of NRAP 9(b). Appellant Rains shall have 100 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Shearing, J. and Becker, J. Maupin, J., dissenting. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB Nos. 34612, 34665. Document No. 00-10334.
06/26/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Monday, August 2, 1999, 10:00 A.M. Court Recorder: Carie A. Hansen. 00-10855
09/25/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Brief. Returned Unfiled Appellant's Opening Brief. Corrected brief due: 10 days.
09/25/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Appendix. Corrected appendix due: 10 days.
10/09/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop box 10/05/00. 00-17795
10/09/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. (Received Certificate of Mailing of Appendix. Placed in the back of Appendix, Volume 1.) 00-17796
11/14/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 11/8/00. 00-19900
11/14/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-19901
12/11/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 12/08/00. 00-21574
12/11/2000Case Status Update Briefing Completed.
02/07/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 5/10/99; 5/19/99. Court Reporter: Kimberly McAndrews. 01-02468
02/20/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Respondent NGA #2 substitutes the law firm of John Peter Lee, Ltd., in place and stead of Curran & Parry. 01-03188
02/20/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. John Peter Lee, Ltd. for respondent NGA #2. 01-03190
05/22/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We note that on December 11, 2000, appellant filed a reply brief, thereby completing the briefing of this appeal. We conclude that all transcripts necessary for the review of this appeal have been filed with this court. To date, appellant has failed to comply with our February 18, 2000, order, in the interests of judicial economy, we waive the requirements of NRAP 9(a) and we vacate that portion of our February 18, 2000, order directing appellant to file either a transcript request form or a certificate indicating that no transcripts are being requested. 01-08532
05/29/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 01-08887
05/29/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Southern Nevada Panel. SNP01A-CY/ML/NB
08/09/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED". SNP01A-CY/ML/NB. 01-13541
09/05/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-13575
09/05/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 14, 2001. 01-13575