judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JAMES C. MACKEY v. DISTRICT JUDGE, THIRD JUDICIAL DISTRICT, SWEETWATER COUNTY, et al.

Case Heading (S-07-0078)
Case Number:S-07-0078Case Docketed On:04/09/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial Dist. Sweetwater County (Circuit)Case Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Prohibition
Short Title:JAMES C. MACKEY v. DISTRICT JUDGE, THIRD JUDICIAL DISTRICT, SWEETWATER COUNTY, et al.
Full Title:JAMES C. MACKEY, Petitioner, v. DISTRICT JUDGE, THIRD JUDICIAL DISTRICT, SWEETWATER COUNTY; CLERK OF THE DISTRICT COURT, THIRD JUDICIAL DISTRICT, SWEETWATER COUNTY; CLERK OF CIRCUIT COURT, THIRD JUDICIAL DISTRICT, SWEETWATER COUNTY; SWEETWATER COUNTY PROSECUTING ATTORNEY; ATTORNEY GENERAL; STATE OF WYOMING

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerJames C. Mackey Pro Se
RespondentThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/09/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/09/2007Petition - Writ - prohibitionPetitionWrit - prohibitionFinal
04/09/2007Fees - Docket fee received and receipted in manual docket bookFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/18/2007Correspondence - Incoming from petitionerCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
05/01/2007Order - Denying Petition for Writ of ProhibitionOrderDenyFinal
05/01/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/04/2007Notice-Incoming - Other - received Motion for Reconsideration For Benefit of Wyoming Criminal Justice System, State Supreme Court; Notice of Federal Interception of May 1, 2007 order Denying Petition for WritNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
06/04/2007Correspondence - Outgoing - returned motion for reconsideration with letter indicating that the matter is closed, and motion not filed.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal