judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JEFFERSON, ELAINE A. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CM-1181
Short Caption:JEFFERSON, ELAINE A. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:09/29/1980

Opening Event Date:09/29/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/31/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/27/1983
Argued/Submitted:03/01/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Joan F. Tilghman YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Patricia A. Broderick YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JEFFERSON, ELAINE A. UNITED STATES
09/29/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/31/1980FiledRecord Completed
06/27/1983FiledBriefing Completed
03/01/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
05/24/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition