judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-455
A-455
01/19/1945
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
HAROLD M. HANKAMER
GEORGE H. TEMPLIN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/03/1945Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
03/21/1945Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/07/1945Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
03/07/1945Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
03/07/1945Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
02/13/1945Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/25/1946Letter Filed
05/29/1945Letter Filed
04/03/1945Supplemental Brief filed
03/27/1945Response to Motion filed
03/21/1945Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/07/1945Exhibits in case/cause filed
03/07/1945Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
03/07/1945Brief in Support of Petition
02/13/1945Letter Filed
02/13/1945Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/02/1945Letter Filed
01/19/1945Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Grievance Committee, Sixteenth DistrictAmicus Curiae
Harold M. HankamerRelator
Grievance Committee of the State Bar of Texas, et al.Amicus Curiae
George H. TemplinRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information