judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-470
A-470
02/05/1945
Application for Writ of Error
WILLIAM LEE KIDD, ET UX.
EDNA LUCILLE YOUNG, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/14/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/15/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
02/05/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/29/1945Letter Filed
11/19/1945Response to Motion filed
11/14/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/25/1945Document received (See Remarks)
02/15/1945Response to Petition
02/05/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/05/1945Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
William Lee Kidd, et ux.Petitioner
Edna Lucille Young, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information