Case Information: 35210 | |||
Short Caption: | GRINSELL VS. GRINSELL | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 34529 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV911510 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/30/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Marshall firm-check no. 12911. | ||
11/30/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-11939 | |
12/29/1999 | Other | Other. Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant. Due: 15 days. | ||
01/18/2000 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 00-00817 | |
03/30/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Response due from appellant: 30 days from the date of this order. The preparation of transcripts and the briefing schedule in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. | 00-05114 | |
04/28/2000 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Memorandum of Points and Authorities on Court's Order to Show Cause. | 00-06982 | |
05/25/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | 00-08861 | |
06/20/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-10314 | |
06/20/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/30/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 22, 2000. | 00-10314 |