judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-559
A-559
04/28/1945
Application for Writ of Error
CHARLES KULOW, ET AL.
FARMERS ROYALTY HOLDING COMPANY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/15/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/08/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
04/28/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/15/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/23/1945Bond
05/16/1945Document received (See Remarks)
05/08/1945Response to Petition
04/28/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/28/1945Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Charles Kulow, et al.Petitioner
Farmers Royalty Holding Company, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information