Case Information: 82-CF-0635 | |||
Short Caption: | ALBERT LEE V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Other Felony |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F6250-77 | Filed Date: | 05/03/1982 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 05/03/1982 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 08/19/1982 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 06/03/1983 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 09/13/1983 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer |
Appellant | Albert Lee | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | LEE, ALBERT UNITED STATES | |||
05/03/1982 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
08/19/1982 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
06/03/1983 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
09/13/1983 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
09/30/1983 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |