judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TARYN L. GREYMOUNTAIN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-16-0080)
Case Number:S-16-0080Case Docketed On:03/24/2016
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:TARYN L. GREYMOUNTAIN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:TARYN L. GREYMOUNTAIN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantTaryn L. GreymountainDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Patricia Lynn Bennett
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPeter K. Michael
David L. Delicath
Christyne Marie Martens

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/24/2016Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/24/2016Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/24/2016Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/20/2016Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance (Patricia L. Bennett obo Appellant)Notice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
04/25/2016Event - Hardcopy received - Entry of AppearanceEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/04/2016Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
05/06/2016Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Voluntary Dismissal of AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/06/2016Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
05/06/2016Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal