judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-558
A-558
04/25/1945
Application for Writ of Error
HUMBLE OIL AND REFINING COMPANY
BOBBY MANZIEL, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/06/1945Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/01/1945Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
06/01/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/03/1945Response to PetitionPetitioner
04/25/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
04/25/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/06/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
06/01/1945Brief in Support of Petition
06/01/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/23/1945Order from Lower Court filed
05/03/1945Response to Petition
04/28/1945Additional Copies received
04/25/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
04/25/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
04/25/1945Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Humble Oil and Refining CompanyPetitioner
Bobby Manziel, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information