Case Heading (S-14-0105) | |||||
Case Number: | S-14-0105 | Case Docketed On: | 04/16/2014 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Sixth Judicial District Campbell County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27) | ||
Short Title: | IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF DAVID J. HARTMANN. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., DEPARTMENT OF WORKFORCE SERVICES, WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION v. DAVID J. HARTMANN | ||||
Full Title: | IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF DAVID J. HARTMANN. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., DEPARTMENT OF WORKFORCE SERVICES, WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellant (Respondent), v. DAVID J. HARTMANN, Appellee (Petitioner). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Department of Workforce Services - Workers' Safety and Compensation Division | Peter K. Michael John D. Rossetti Michael J. Finn Samantha Caselli |
Appellee | David J. Hartmann | Peter James Timbers |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Workers' Compensation |
Opinion Number: | 2015 WY 1 |
Citation: | 342 P.3d 377 (Wyo. 2015) |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
04/16/2014 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
04/16/2014 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
04/16/2014 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
04/16/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
06/03/2014 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
06/03/2014 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant/Respondent, Department of Workforce Services, Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of designation of record on appeal. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
07/14/2014 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
07/16/2014 | Event - Hardcopy received - Petitioner's [Appellee's] Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Respondent's [Appellant's] Opening Brief to August 12, 2014 | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
07/16/2014 | Order - Grant - extension of time | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
08/12/2014 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
08/13/2014 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
08/14/2014 | Notice-Incoming - Designation of record by Appellee | Notice-Incoming | Designation of record | Final | |
08/25/2014 | Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
09/03/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
09/05/2014 | Order - Assigning to expedited docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
09/15/2014 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, two volumes; Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
09/15/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
01/06/2015 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order - Reversed and Remanded with Justice Kite writing for the Court. (Appeal converted to Petition for Writ of Review) | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
01/16/2015 | Motion - Fees and costs | Motion | Fees and costs | Final | |
01/20/2015 | Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellee, received the original copy of motion and one copy with envelope to file and return. Requested six additional copies | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
01/22/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for Attorneys Fees; and received proposed Order | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/18/2015 | Order - Awarding attorney fees and costs | Order | Awarding attorney fees and costs | Final | |
02/18/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
02/18/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
02/18/2015 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
02/23/2015 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/19/2015. | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |