judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WILLIAM J. HAWTHORNE V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CF-0549
Short Caption:WILLIAM J. HAWTHORNE V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead:82-CF-0549Consolidated: 82-CF-1675
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:04/12/1982

Opening Event Date:04/12/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/15/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/09/1983
Argued/Submitted:12/07/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantWilliam J. Hawthorne N
Claire O. Ducker NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901HAWTHORNE, WILLIAM J. UNITED STATES
04/12/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/15/1982FiledRecord Completed
09/09/1983FiledBriefing Completed
12/07/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/19/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition