judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COUNTY OF CLARK VS. PLANE REALTY C/W 34904

Case Information: 35205
Short Caption:COUNTY OF CLARK VS. PLANE REALTY C/W 34904Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 34904 *, 35205Related Case(s): 34904
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A356193Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Leavitt, Maupin, RoseCase Status:Case Closed
Replacement:Senior Justice Young for Justice RosePanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/14/1999 / Hoppe, CraigSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:04/09/2001 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:04/09/2001How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/29/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Sat in district court proceedings.
11/29/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/29/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-11901
12/06/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William C. Turner. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/14/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Craig A. Hoppe.
12/27/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-13197
01/21/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to file the docketing statement and to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-00976
02/03/2000MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Motion to Consolidate Appeal and Allow Filing One Docketing Statement and One Set of Transcript Requests (nos. 34904/35205 o.k. to file per S. Jump). 00-01787
02/03/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (nos. 34904/35205 o.k. to file S. Jump). 00-01788
02/03/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. December 10, 1999 Transcripts requested: To Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio (nos. 34904/34905 o.k. to file per S. Jump). 00-01791
02/03/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. November 9, 1999 Transcripts requested: To Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio (nos. 34902/35205).. 00-01792
02/03/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. October 22, 1999 Transcripts requested: To Court Reporter: Patsy Smith (nos. 34904/34905 o.k. to file S. Jump). 00-01793
02/03/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. August 23, 1999 through August 27, 1999 Transcripts requested: To Court Reporter: Patsy Smith (nos. 34904/35205 o.k. to file S. Jump). 00-01794
03/08/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Attorney James J. Leavitt.
03/10/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. On February 3, 2000, appellant filed a motion to consolidate these appeals. fn1[Appellant also requested permission to file a single docketing statement and one set of transcripts. Both items having been filed in these matters on Februay 3, 2000, we deny this part of appellant's request as moot.] We grant the unopposed motion and consolidate these apeals for all appellate purposes. Appellant: 90 days to file and serve a single combined opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed with NRAP 31(a)(1). Nos. 34904, 35205. 00-03780
03/13/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: December 10, 1999. To Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. (Identical to transcript request forms filed on 2/3/00. No action required). (Nos. 34904 and 35205).
03/13/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: November 9, 1998. To Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. (Identical to transcript request forms filed on 2/3/00. No action required). (Nos. 34904 and 35205).
03/13/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: August 23, 1999 through August 27, 1999. To Court Reporter: Patsy Smith. (Identical to transcript request forms filed on 2/3/00. No action required). (Nos. 34904 and 35205).
03/13/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: October 22, 1999. To Court Reporter: Patsy Smith. (Identical to transcript request forms filed on 2/3/00. No action required). (Nos. 34904 and 35205).
03/14/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file with this court proof of service on respondent of each of the four transcript requests previously filed. Nos. 34904, 35205. 00-04009
04/12/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 11/9/98, 12/10/99. Court Reporter: Renee Silvaggio. (Transcripts filed in no. 34904.) Nos. 34904, 35205.
04/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We again direct appellant within 10 days of the date of this order to file proofs of service on respondent of each of the four transcript request forms or to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed on appellant's counsel. Nos. 34904, 35205. Document No. 00-06143.
04/28/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 34904, 35205. Document no. 00-06935
05/02/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Court Reporter: Patsy K. Smith. Nos. 34904 and 35205. Document no. 00-07138
05/02/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Notice to Provide Proof of Service (to Patsy K. Smith). Due Date: 5 days
05/17/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On May 2, 2000, court reporter Patsy K. Smith filed a motion for an extension of time to file the requested transcripts. To date, reporter Smith has failed to file proof of service. In spite of the procedural deficiency, we grant the motion. Court reporter Smith shall have until May 27, 2000, to prepare, serve and file the requested transcritps. Nos. 34904, 35205. Document No. 00-08222.
05/26/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (nos. 34904/25205).
06/01/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Nos. 34904, 35205. Document no. 00-09229
06/01/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The second application for an extension of time filed May 26, 2000, is granted. Court reporter Patsy K. Smith shall have to and including June 9, 2000, to file and serve the transcripts requested in this matter. Nos. 34904, 35205. Document No. 00-09282.
06/09/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have until June 26, 2000, to serve and file the opening brief and appendix. Nos. 34904, 35205. Document No. 009784.
06/19/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 8/24/99, 8/25/99, 8/26/99, 8/27/99, 10/22/99. Court Reporter: Patsy K. Smith. Nos. 34904, 35205.
06/27/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 6/26/00. (Nos. 34904 and 35205.) Document No. 00-11028.
06/27/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. (Nos. 34904 and 35205.) Document No. 00-10029.
07/07/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Joint Appendix - nos. 34904/35205).
07/26/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: August 25, 2000. Nos. 34904/35205. Doc. No. 00-12934
08/10/2000MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Request for Permission to File Answering Brief in Excess of 30 Pages. Nos. 34904/35205. Doc. No. 00-13889
08/18/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. Respondent shall have to and including August 25, 2000, to file and serve the 40 page answering brief. Nos. 34904, 35205. Document No. 00-14453.
08/28/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 8/25/00. Nos. 34904 & 35205. (00-15015)
08/28/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Nos. 34904 & 35205. (00-15121)
09/20/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: October 20, 2000. Nos. 34905/35205 Doc. No. 00-16607
10/20/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: LV Drop Box 10/18/00. Nos. 34904 & 35205. (00-18659)
11/07/2000Order/Procedural Order. Our records indicate that court recorder Kimberly McAndrews, and not reporter Smith, was the court reporter at the August 23, 1999, proceedings. Accordingly, McAndrews shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file the August 23, 1999, transcript or inform the court in writing why the transcripts cannot be produced. Nos. 34904/35205. Doc. No. 00-19581
02/07/2001OtherDisqualification of Justice Rose. Nos. 334904/35205.
02/09/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 23, 1999. Court Reporter: Kimberly D. McAndrews. Nos. 34904/35205 (01-02668)
02/26/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on April 9, 2001, at 10:30 a.m. (Nos. 34904 and 35205) (NNP01A-CY/MS/DA)
03/26/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. (Nos. 34904 and 35205)
04/09/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP01A-CY/MS/DA. Nos. 34904/35205.
07/13/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. These are consolidated appeals from a judgment after a jury verdict in an eminent domain case. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP01A-CY/MS/DA. Nos. 34904/35205 01-11891
07/27/2001MotionFiled Motion. County of Clark's Motion for Publication of Order of Reversal and Remand. Nos. 34904/35205 (01-12717)
07/31/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100 from Kermitt L. Waters-check no. 4536.
07/31/2001Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Petition for Rehearing and Motion for Publication of Decision. Mailed on: July 30, 2001 Federal Express. Nos. 34904/35205 (01-12914).
04/03/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. Further, we deny both parties motions for publication. Nos. 34904/35205 (02-05953). NNP01A-CY/MS/DA.
04/15/2002Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. and Motion for Publication of Decision. Nos. 34904/35205. Mailed on: 4/12/02--FedEx. (02-06669)
04/18/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-05967
04/18/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/29/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 22, 2002. 02-05967
05/08/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, " . . . we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted." NRAP 40A. Further, we deny respondent's motion for publication. fn1[The Honorable A. William Maupin, Chief Justice, and the Honorable Robert E. Rose and Honorable Myron E. Leavitt, Justices, voluntarily recused themselves from participation in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC-CY/MM/DA/NB. Nos. 34904/35205. (02-08037)