Case: PD-0302-90
PD-0302-90
03/21/1990
PDR Case Type
ROSNER, FRANK ROY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/24/1990 | RESPONSE FILED | State | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/08/1990 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
05/23/1990 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
04/24/1990 | RESPONSE FILED | | |
04/23/1990 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
03/21/1990 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/18/1990 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STATE OF TEXAS | State | John Holmes |
Rosner, Frank Roy | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Clinard J. Hanby Richard Haynes |
Court of Appeals Information:
14-89-00085-CR
Aff 2-8-90
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
Honorable W. Harmon/Frank Price
498080