judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEASEPARTNERS CORP. VS. ROBERT BROOKS TRUST

Case Information: 34661
Short Caption:LEASEPARTNERS CORP. VS. ROBERT BROOKS TRUSTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35008
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A297007Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:YoungCase Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/24/1999 / Segel, M.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/13/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Law firm of Lionel Sawyer & Collins.
08/13/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Smith Larsen & Wixom, Chartered--check no. 003529.
08/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07492
08/23/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Notice re: Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 99-07840
08/24/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/27/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-10529
11/08/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from Settlement Judge Segal re: Nos. 34661 and 35008. 99-11024
11/17/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to file the docketing statement; 70 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 99-11416
12/13/1999MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 99-12505
12/21/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed, the parties to bear their own costs." NNP/CLK 99-12951
12/21/1999Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.