judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WALKER, ROOSEVELT UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CM-1047
Short Caption:WALKER, ROOSEVELT UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M7987-79Filed Date:09/15/1980

Opening Event Date:09/15/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/17/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/16/1983
Argued/Submitted:02/07/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Craig N. MooreYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WALKER, ROOSEVELT UNITED STATES
09/15/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/17/1980FiledRecord Completed
11/16/1983FiledBriefing Completed
02/07/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/10/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition