Case: PD-1325-98
PD-1325-98
08/19/1998
PDR Case Type
HAMILTON, LEISHA
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
11/13/1998 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
10/28/1998 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
10/28/1998 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
09/21/1998 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
08/19/1998 | PDR FILED | | |
08/19/1998 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/23/1998 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Hamilton, Leisha | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Richard L. Wardroup |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | William C Sowder |
Court of Appeals Information:
07-97-00167-CR
AFF 5-14-98
7th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
99th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable William R. Shaver
96-423380