judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WYODAK RESOURCES DEVELOPMENT CORP. v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Case Heading (S-16-0075)
Case Number:S-16-0075Case Docketed On:03/17/2016
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Rule 12.09(b) Certification - Civil - Mines and Minerals (Title 30)
Short Title:WYODAK RESOURCES DEVELOPMENT CORP. v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE
Full Title:WYODAK RESOURCES DEVELOPMENT CORP., Appellant (Petitioner), v. WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWyodak Resources Development Corp.Lawrence J. Wolfe
Jenifer E. Calkins Scoggin
AppelleeDepartment of RevenuePeter K. Michael
Ryan T. Schelhaas
Karl D. Anderson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Taxation - Mineral
Opinion Number:2017 WY 6
Citation:387 P.3d 725 (Wyo. 2017)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/17/2016Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/17/2016Fees - Docket fee received (Order Certifying Case rcvd. 3/2/16, docketing fee received 3/17/16)FeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/17/2016Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order of certification Rule 12.09(b)Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder of certification Rule 12.09(b)Final
03/17/2016Notice-Outgoing - E-filing requirement sent to Megan EwaldNotice-OutgoingE-filing requirementFinal
03/29/2016Order - Rule 12.09(b) Certification - Accept - Notice of Acceptance of Certified CaseOrderRule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptFinal
04/11/2016Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice and index from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/02/2016Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/02/2016Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant/Petitioner's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/03/2016Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/01/2016Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/01/2016Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
06/01/2016Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Opening Brief; Appellant/Petitioner Wyodak Resources Development Corp. Statement of Costs; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/15/2016Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/15/2016Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/19/2016Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
07/19/2016Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/20/2016Order - Granting withdrawal of counsel - Megan L. Ewald allowed to withdraw as counsel for AppellantOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
08/01/2016Notice-Incoming - Appellants Notice Regarding Reply BriefNotice-IncomingStatus report - otherFinal
08/02/2016Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/02/2016Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Notice Regarding Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/10/2016Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/10/2016Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk. Volume I - Original Papers; Volumes II - IV - Agency RecordRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/10/2016Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/11/2016Order - Oral argument - amending scheduleOrderOral argument - amending scheduleFinal
08/16/2016Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Karl D. Anderson obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/19/2016Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Lawrence J. Wolfe obo AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/21/2016Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice argued before Chief Justice Burke, Justices Hill, Davis, Fox and Kautz (Lawrence J. Wolfe obo Appellant; Karl D. Anderson obo Appellee) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/23/2017Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming the decision of the Wyoming State Board of EqualizationOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/08/2017Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/08/2017Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/08/2017Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/08/2017Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/15/2017Service - Certified mail signature return card - record received 2/13/17ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal