judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STEVENS, RONALD J. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CF-0605
Short Caption:STEVENS, RONALD J. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F6189-80Filed Date:04/20/1982

Opening Event Date:04/20/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/23/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/08/1983
Argued/Submitted:04/19/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901STEVENS, RONALD J. UNITED STATES
04/20/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/23/1982FiledRecord Completed
02/08/1983FiledBriefing Completed
04/19/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/29/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition