Case Information: 33861 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE GUARDIANSHIP OF KRATISH | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - G19672 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/23/1999 / Scotti, Richard | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/08/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Victor Lee Miller--check no. 9960. | ||
03/08/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 99-01614 | |
03/23/1999 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Richard F. Scotti. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
04/12/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | 99-02732 | |
04/16/1999 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. | ||
04/22/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the docketing statement. | 99-03132 | |
04/30/1999 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 99-03459 | |
06/25/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: July 15, 1999. | 99-05592 | |
12/14/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 7, 2000. | 99-12593 | |
02/08/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 1, 2000. | 00-01956 | |
05/05/2000 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 00-07423 | |
05/11/2000 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. The court will conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 00-07830 | |
06/08/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Response due from appellant: 30 days from the date of this order. The briefing schedule and transcript preparation in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. | 00-09674 | |
07/12/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. To file the Response for the Order to Show Cause. | 00-12011 | |
07/13/2000 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. Appellant's response to this court's order shall be served and filed on or before August 9, 2000. | 00-12112 | |
08/11/2000 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 00-14045 | |
04/05/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. " . . . we dismiss this appeal." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB | 01-05802 | |
05/01/2001 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 01-06050 | |
05/01/2001 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/01/2001 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 9, 2001. | 01-06050 |