Case Heading (S-14-0230) | |||||
Case Number: | S-14-0230 | Case Docketed On: | 09/15/2014 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Third Judicial District Sweetwater County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20) | ||
Short Title: | RYAN JOHN WALDRON v. ANNDEE MAE WALDRON, n/k/a ANNDEE MAE HAMILTON-COOPER | ||||
Full Title: | RYAN JOHN WALDRON, Appellant (Defendant), v. ANNDEE MAE WALDRON, n/k/a ANNDEE MAE HAMILTON-COOPER, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Ryan John Waldron | Michael William Stulken |
Appellee | AnnDee Mae Hamilton-Cooper | Eric Frederick Phillips |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Child Custody/Visitation, Jurisdiction |
Opinion Number: | 2015 WY 64 |
Citation: | 349 P.3d 974 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
09/15/2014 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
09/15/2014 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
09/15/2014 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
09/15/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
10/28/2014 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
10/30/2014 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
10/31/2014 | Notice-Incoming - Designation of record - copy of Appellant's Designation of Record on Appeal; and copy of Appellant's Amended Designation of Record on Appeal. | Notice-Incoming | Designation of record | Final | |
12/10/2014 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
12/12/2014 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/15/2014 | Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
12/19/2014 | Notice-Incoming - Copy of designation of record filed in the district court by appellee | Notice-Incoming | Designation of record | Final | |
12/24/2014 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
12/29/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
12/29/2014 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/29/2014 | Notice-Incoming - Designation of record | Notice-Incoming | Designation of record | Final | |
12/30/2014 | Order - Assigning to expedited docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
01/13/2015 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
01/13/2015 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volumes I-II - Original Papers | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
01/13/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
05/01/2015 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order, dismissed with Justice Davis writing for the Court. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
05/14/2015 | Petition - Reinstatement (rehearing) | Petition | Reinstatement | Final | |
05/18/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Petition for Reinstatement of Appeal and Brief in Support of Petition for Reinstatement of Appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/02/2015 | Order Denying Petition for Reinstatement (Rehearing) | Order | Petition for rehearing - deny | Final | |
06/02/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
06/02/2015 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
06/02/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
06/02/2015 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
06/08/2015 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record received 6/4/15 | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |