judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HUDSON (LARRY) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 34666
Short Caption:HUDSON (LARRY) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - 968181Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/13/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/13/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/13/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-07528
08/18/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Setting of Trial Date May 25, 1999. Court Reporter: Eric V. Nelson. 99-07700
08/24/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. July 2, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Barbara J. Johnson. 99-07894
08/24/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due: September 17, 1999. 99-07905
09/17/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-08795
09/17/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-08796
09/28/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Amended Certificate of Mailing. 99-09282
09/30/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: October 14, 1999. 99-09376
10/08/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-09739
10/29/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief and appendix due: 40 days. fn[We suspend the requirement in NRAP9 for counsel to file a certified transcript.] Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. 99-10595
12/07/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 12/06/99. 99-12242
12/27/1999BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 12/23/99. 99-13181
12/27/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 99-13184
01/10/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 1/7/00. 00-00355
01/10/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/13/2000Case Status Update Resubmitted for Decision. Panel: Northern Nevada Panel. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML.
05/17/2001Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. By the Court, Becker, J. We concur: Young and Shearing, JJ. Maupin, C.J., concurring. Agosti, J., with whom Rose and Leavitt, JJ., agree, concurring. 117 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 35. EN BANC 01-08190
06/07/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from attorney Harriet E. Cummings regarding the Opinion filed in this case on March 17, 2001 (117 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 35). 01-09505
06/12/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-08413
06/12/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/21/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 13, 2001. 01-08413