judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE OF WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS v. LEONARD (LEE) WATTS

Case Heading (S-07-0050)
Case Number:S-07-0050Case Docketed On:03/02/2007
Linked To: S-07-0095
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Fremont CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Other
Short Title:STATE OF WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS v. LEONARD (LEE) WATTS
Full Title:STATE OF WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, WYOMING STATE PENITENTIARY and WYOMING HONOR FARM, Petitioners, v. LEONARD (LEE) WATTS, PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF TAMMY SUE WATTS, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerDepartment of CorrectionsPatrick J. Crank
John William Renneisen
Misha Westby
Christopher Levi Martin
PetitionerDepartment of Corrections - Wyoming State PenitentiaryPatrick J. Crank
John William Renneisen
Misha Westby
Christopher Levi Martin
PetitionerDepartment of Corrections - Honor FarmPatrick J. Crank
John William Renneisen
Misha Westby
Christopher Levi Martin
RespondentLeonard Lee WattsDavid B. Hooper
Tom A. Glassberg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Governmental Claims, Jurisdiction - Appellate, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 19
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/02/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/02/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/02/2007Petition - Writ - reviewPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
03/19/2007Response/Objection - Petition for reviewResponse/ObjectionPetition for reviewFinal
03/20/2007Order - Petition for review - grantOrderPetition for review - grantFinal
05/04/2007Brief - Petitioner; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefPetitionerFinal
06/21/2007Brief - Failure to file - respondentBriefFailure to file - respondentFinal
07/06/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/09/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volumes I & II, original papers; Volume III, transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
07/11/2007Order - Consolidating cases, for purposes of oral argument and decision.OrderConsolidating casesFinal
07/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Misha Westby.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from David B. Hooper on behalf of appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/15/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Christopher Levi Martin, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Misha Westby, Senior Assistant Attorney General, argument by Ms. Westby for appellants; David B. Hooper for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/15/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/22/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order dismissing. Justice Kite writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/11/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/11/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/14/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/12/08 by Kristi Green.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal