judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ADAMS, RUFUS E. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CF-0858
Short Caption:ADAMS, RUFUS E. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead:82-CF-0858Consolidated: 82-CF-1153
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:06/24/1982

Opening Event Date:06/24/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/29/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/20/1984
Argued/Submitted:12/07/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
A. Franklin Burgess NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
James W. KleinNY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901ADAMS, RUFUS E. UNITED STATES
06/24/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/29/1984FiledRecord Completed
09/20/1984FiledBriefing Completed
12/07/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/07/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition