judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CARSON FAMILY HEALTH CENTER VS. M & T GROUP

Case Information: 33882
Short Caption:CARSON FAMILY HEALTH CENTER VS. M & T GROUPCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9401688AClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:03/22/1999 / Susich, J.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:12/13/2000 at 8:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:12/13/2000How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/12/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Glade L. Hall--check no. 2250.
03/12/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-01791
03/22/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: J. Thomas Susich. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
04/08/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-02669
04/08/1999Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement. 99-02670
04/12/1999MotionFiled Response to Motion. Response to Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Docketing Statement. 99-02773
04/14/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Document: The docketing statement provisionally submitted on April 8, 1999 shall be filed, forthwith. 99-02872
04/14/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-02670
06/16/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: July 14, 1999. 99-05197
07/14/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. Association of Attorney. Law firm of Brooke & Shaw associates as counsel for respondent M & T Group. 99-06285
07/21/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-06587
08/10/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with provisions of NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 99-07389
08/24/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-07885
11/22/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Address/firm name change - Daniel Walsh. 99-11662
12/10/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 12/08/99. 99-12440
12/10/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Called for a Certificate of Service. 99-12442
12/16/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service (for Appellant's Appendix). 99-12752
01/10/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 01/10/00. (M & T Group) 00-00360
01/10/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. (M & T Group) 00-00361
01/10/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 1/10/00. (State of Nevada.) 00-00406
01/10/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. (State of Nevada.) 00-00408
01/11/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (State of Nevada.) 00-00460
01/12/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. 00-00539
01/24/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-01115
01/24/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Amended Certificate of Service Re: Notice of Change of Address (no action required). 00-01116
01/25/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondent State of Nevada's Response to Carson Family Health Center's Motion for Extension of Time. 00-01241
01/28/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Appellant shall have to and including February 10, 2000, to file and serve the reply brief. 00-01398
02/11/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 2/10/00. 00-02196
08/28/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on October 9, 2000 at 9:00 a.m. in Carson City. (NNP00A-MS/DA/ML) 00-15093
09/13/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Postpone and Reset for Oral Argument. 00-16155
09/21/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Notice of Non-Opposition. 00-16719
09/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Continuing Oral Argument. On September 13, 2000, respondent State of Nevada moved to continue the oral argument. We grant the motion. We hereby vacate the oral argument presently scheduled for october 9, 2000, at 9 a.m. We direct the clerk of this court to reschedule this appeal for oral argument in December, 2000, before the Northern Nevada Panel. Argument shall be limited to thirty minutes. 00-16727
10/30/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on December 13, 2000 at 8:30 a.m. in Carson City. (NNP00A-MS/DA/ML)
11/27/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
12/13/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Northern Nevada Panel. NNP00A-MS/DA/ML
03/06/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 01-04068
04/03/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-04201
04/03/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/06/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 4, 2001. 01-04201