Case Heading (S-14-0215) | |||||
Case Number: | S-14-0215 | Case Docketed On: | 08/25/2014 | ||
Linked To: | S-14-0216 | ||||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Second Judicial District Albany County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1) | ||
Short Title: | RUBY RIVER CANYON RANCH, LTD, a Colorado Limited Partnership; and WESTERN CONSERVATION PARTNERS I, LLC, a Colorado Limited Liability Company v. DENNIS S. FLYNN, individually and as trustee, NANCY L. FLYNN, individually and as trustee, the DENNIS S. FLYNN REVOCABLE TRUST under agreement dated April 2, 2009, Dennis S. Flynn, Trustee, the NANCY L. FLYNN REVOCABLE TRUST under agreement dated April 2, 2009, Nancy L. Flynn, Trustee, WILLIAM I. KETTLEWELL and GAYLE A. KETTLEWELL | ||||
Full Title: | RUBY RIVER CANYON RANCH, LTD, a Colorado Limited Partnership; and WESTERN CONSERVATION PARTNERS I, LLC, a Colorado Limited Liability Company, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. DENNIS S. FLYNN, individually and as trustee, NANCY L. FLYNN, individually and as trustee, the DENNIS S. FLYNN REVOCABLE TRUST under agreement dated April 2, 2009, Dennis S. Flynn, Trustee, the NANCY L. FLYNN REVOCABLE TRUST under agreement dated April 2, 2009, Nancy L. Flynn, Trustee, WILLIAM I. KETTLEWELL and GAYLE A. KETTLEWELL, Appellees (Defendants). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Ruby River Canyon Ranch, LTD | Alexander K. Davison Jared Edward Seegmiller |
Appellant | Western Conservation Partners I, LLC | Alexander K. Davison Jared Edward Seegmiller |
Appellee | Dennis S. Flynn | Randall B. Reed David James Willms |
Appellee | Nancy L. Flynn | Randall B. Reed David James Willms |
Appellee | Dennis S. Flynn Revocable Trust | Randall B. Reed David James Willms |
Appellee | Nancy L. Flynn Revocable Trust | Randall B. Reed David James Willms |
Appellee | William I. Kettlewell | Randall B. Reed David James Willms |
Appellee | Gayle A. Kettlewell | Randall B. Reed David James Willms |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Attorney Fees, Contracts, Property - Real - Adverse Possession |
Opinion Number: | 2015 WY 74 |
Citation: | 350 P.3d 748 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
08/25/2014 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
08/25/2014 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
08/25/2014 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
08/25/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
08/25/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - E-filing requirement and service of orders to Messrs. Reed, Willms and Speight. | Notice-Outgoing | E-filing requirement | Final | |
08/29/2014 | Notice-Incoming - Amended index | Notice-Incoming | Amended index | Final | |
10/09/2014 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
10/09/2014 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellants Ruby River Canyon Ranch, LTD and Western Consecration Partners I, LLC. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
10/10/2014 | Notice-Incoming - Errata | Notice-Incoming | Errata | Final | |
10/10/2014 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Errata to Brief of Appellants Ruby River Canyon Ranch, LTD and Western Conservation Partners I, LLC. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
11/26/2014 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
11/26/2014 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees Response Brief and Designation of Record on Appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/03/2014 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
12/08/2014 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Alexander K. Davison obo Ruby River And Western Conservation Partners | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
12/09/2014 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting received by Randall B. Reed obo of Appellee. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
12/16/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
12/22/2014 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, five volumes (Volumes I - IV, Original Papers; Volume V, Transcripts) | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
12/22/2014 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
01/15/2015 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Burke, Justices Hill, Kite, Davis and Fox (Alexander K. Davison obo Appellants; Randall B. Reed and David J. Willms, argument by Mr. Reed obo Appellees) and taken under advisement | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
05/21/2015 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in S-14-0215, reversing in S-14-0216. Chief Justice Burke writing for the Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
06/05/2015 | Motion - Fees and costs (case number should be S-14-0215 on front page, numbers transposed) | Motion | Fees and costs | Final | |
06/05/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Dennis S. Flynn et al.'s Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs of Appeal; Dennis S. Flynn et al.'s Statement of Costs Pursuant to Rule 10.01, W.R.A.P.; and received proposed order. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/23/2015 | Response/Objection - Costs | Response/Objection | Costs | Final | |
06/23/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Response of Ruby River Canyon Ranch, Ltd. et al. to Dennis S. Flynn et. al.'s Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs of Appeal. | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/25/2015 | Response/Objection - Costs (Reply to Response) | Response/Objection | Costs | Final | |
06/25/2015 | Event - Hardcopy received - Dennis S. Flynn et al.'s Reply to Ruby River Canyon Ranch, Ltd.'s Response to Dennis S. Flynn's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs of Appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/30/2015 | Order Granting Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs | Order | Awarding attorney fees and costs | Final | |
06/30/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
06/30/2015 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
06/30/2015 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
06/30/2015 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
07/06/2015 | Service - Certified mail signature return card- Record received (no date given) | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |