judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

R.M. JONES BELL, ROBERT A.

Case Information: 85-CV-0023
Short Caption:R.M. JONES BELL, ROBERT A.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead: 84-CV-1755 Consolidated:85-CV-0023
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA16085-81Filed Date:01/02/1985

Opening Event Date:01/02/1985Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/08/1985Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/19/1985
Argued/Submitted:09/24/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Amicus-AppelleeJohn Doe N
Robert W. Acker NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
James C. Gregg YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Suzanne M. Caldwell YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901R.M. JONES T/A RM JONES & ASSOC. CON. ENG BELL, ROBERT A. ROBERT BELL ASSOCIATES INC.
01/01/1906 ACKERR DC LAND TITLE ASSOCIATION
01/02/1985FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
02/08/1985FiledRecord Completed
04/19/1985FiledBriefing Completed
09/24/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
12/31/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition