judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-821
A-821
02/02/1946
Application for Writ of Error
HOUSTON ELECTRIC COMPANY
SELMA DORSETT
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/27/1946Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/18/1946Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
02/08/1946Response to PetitionRespondent
02/02/1946Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/27/1946Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/29/1946Submission reset
03/18/1946Brief in Support of Petition
03/06/1946Document received (See Remarks)
02/08/1946Response to Petition
02/02/1946Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/02/1946Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Selma DorsettRespondent
Houston Electric CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information