Case Information: 38717 | |||
Short Caption: | SCOTT (MCKINLEY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C38882 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/05/2002 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/05/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
11/05/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 01-18420 | |
11/30/2001 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Certified copy of final order due: 30 days. Certified copy of the record on appeal due: 120 days. fn2[The record shall not include any exhibit filed in the district court.] | 01-20057 | |
01/22/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of order or judgment appealed from filed in district court on: January 11, 2002. | 02-01437 | |
04/05/2002 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 02-06103 | |
04/05/2002 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/11/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." - SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 02-11929 | |
08/06/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-12044 | |
08/06/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/22/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 13, 2002. | 02-12044 |